blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0996115


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
18.07.2008 Change - representative published on  20.08.2008  [2008/34]
06.06.2008 No opposition filed within time limit published on  09.07.2008  [2008/28]
29.06.2007 (Expected) grant published on  01.08.2007  [2007/31]
29.06.2007 Change - inventor published on  01.08.2007  [2007/31]
28.06.2007 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
28.06.2007 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
06.04.2007 Change - representative published on  09.05.2007  [2007/19]
16.02.2007 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
06.10.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.09.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.10.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.10.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.04.2003 Change - extension states
04.01.2003 Definitive list of designations published on  19.02.2003  [2003/08]
01.11.2002 Request for examination filed published on  18.12.2002  [2002/51]
02.10.2002 Renewal fee
07.06.2002 Change - representative published on  24.07.2002  [2002/30]
12.04.2002 Publication of search report published on  29.05.2002  [2002/22]
03.10.2001 Renewal fee
17.03.2001 Change - applicant published on  02.05.2001 [2001/18]
10.03.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]