blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0996115
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP4015332BGlobal Dossier 28.11.2007B2
JP2000123336 28.04.2000A
Priority number Date
US17590798 20.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0996115Global Dossier 01.08.2007B1
EP0996115 29.05.2002A3
EP0996115 26.04.2000A2
Priority number Date
US17590798 20.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69936699T 06.03.2008T2
DE69936699D 13.09.2007D1
Priority number Date
US17590798 20.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HK1026056 11.01.2008A1
Priority number Date
US17590798 20.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6122124 19.09.2000A
Priority number Date
US17590798 20.10.1998