blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0996115

Designated contracting states DE 
 GB 
 NL 
Examination procedure19.06.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
24.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
21.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
European patent granted01.08.2007
Opposition procedure06.05.2008No opposition filed within time limit published on 09.07.2008 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:26.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:26.04.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:02.05.2001 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION
 
Event date:29.05.2002 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:29.05.2002 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:18.12.2002 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20021021
 
Event date:19.02.2003 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Designated State(s):DE GB NL
 
Event date:01.08.2007 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE GB NL
 
Event date:01.08.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:13.09.2007 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69936699
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20070913
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:11.01.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HK GR 1026056 HK
Code Expl.:+STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG
 
Event date:09.07.2008 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20080506
 
Event date:30.11.2009 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20090924
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:13.04.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL V1
Code Expl.:-LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE
Effective DATE:20110401
 
Event date:31.08.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20110401
 
Event date:25.04.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
Free Format Text:REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120329 AND 20120404
 
Event date:31.10.2012 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20120925
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:31.01.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20120927
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:28.05.2014 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20130930
 
Event date:26.06.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R119 69936699 DE
Code Expl.:-APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20140401
 
Event date:31.07.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130930
 
Event date:29.08.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20140401