Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0996115

EP0996115 - Servo system and method with digitally controlled oscillator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.06.2008
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 20.08.2008  [2008/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
[N/P]
Former [2007/31]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company A Delaware Corporation
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, California 94304 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Fasen, Donald J.
12129 W. Musket Drive
Boise, Idaho 83713 / US
02 / Hessing, Charles E.
11369 W. Hickory Nut
Boise, Idaho 83713 / US
03 / Willcocks, Benjamin A.
28 Druid Road
Bristol BS9 1LH / GB
 [2007/31]
Former [2000/17]01 / Fasen, Donald J.
12129 W. Musket Drive
Boise, Idaho 83713 / US
02 / Hessing, Charles E.
11369 W. Hickory Nut
Boise, Idaho 83713 / US
03 / Willcocks, Benjamin A.
28 Druid Road
Bristol BS9 1HL / GB
Representative(s)Marsh, David John
Hewlett-Packard Limited Intellectual Property Section Building 3 Filton Road Stoke Gifford
Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]Marsh, David John
Hewlett-Packard Limited Intellectual Property Section Building 3 Filton Road Stoke Gifford Bristol
BS34 8QZ / GB
Former [2007/19]Marsh, David John
Hewlett-Packard Limited Intellectual Property and General Legal Section Building 3, Filton Road
Stoke Gifford, Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB
Former [2002/30]Carpmaels & Ransford
43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2000/17]Colgan, Stephen James , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date99307725.430.09.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateUS1998017590720.10.1998         Original published format: US 175907
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0996115
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0996115
Date:29.05.2002
[2002/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0996115
Date:01.08.2007
Language:EN
[2007/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.04.2002
ClassificationInternational:G11B5/584
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   NL [2003/08]
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Servosystem und Verfahren mit digitalgesteuertem Oszillator[2000/17]
English:Servo system and method with digitally controlled oscillator[2000/17]
French:Système et méthode d'asservissement avec un oscillateur contrôlé numériquement[2000/17]
Examination procedure21.10.2002Examination requested  [2002/51]
23.02.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.06.2007Fee for grant paid
19.06.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.05.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
24.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
21.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP0690442  (IBM [US]) [AD] 1,10 * claims 20-23 * * column 4, line 21 - line 34 *;
 [A]US3984868  (RAGLE HERBERT UNDERWOOD, et al) [A] 1,3,10 * claims 1-4,10 * * column 5, line 46 - column 7, line 10 * * column 1, line 15 - line 18 * * figure 3 *;
 [A]US4390910  (WILSON ROSSER S) [A] 1,10 * claims 1-10 * * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 58 * * column 1, line 22 - column 3, line 5 * * abstract *;
 [A]EP0618574  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,10 * figures 2,11 * * page 8, line 29 - line 28 * * page 5, line 51 - page 6, line 48 * * page 2, line 25 - page 3, line 2 * * abstract *;
 [A]US3882402  (JENSEN DALE J) [A] 1,10 * abstract * * column 2, line 10 - line 33 * * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 41 * * claims 1-3 *;
 [AP]  ANONYMOUS, "LTO Program: The First Year", INTERNET ARTICLE, URL: http://www.lto-technology.com/newsite/html/about_white2.html, (20020307), XP002194468
 [A]  BARRETT R C ET AL, "TIMING-BASED TRACK-FOLLOWING SERVO FOR LINEAR TAPE SYSTEMS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MAGNETICS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (199807), vol. 34, no. 4, PART 1, ISSN 0018-9464, pages 1872 - 1877, XP000833231

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/20.706730