blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0990978 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0990978



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 136
14.03.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
22.11.2002 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
22.11.2002 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
28.10.2002 Confirmation of withdrawal of application/closure of proceedings Search / examination 1
14.10.2002 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
23.02.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
18.10.1999 Drawings Search / examination 11
18.10.1999 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
30.09.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
30.09.1999 Claims Search / examination 10
30.09.1999 Description Search / examination 31
30.09.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.09.1999 Drawings Search / examination 11
30.09.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
30.09.1999 Translation of priority document Search / examination 58