Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990978

EP0990978 - Information processing apparatus, method and computer program for virtual reality object management using auras [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  25.10.2002
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 11.12.2002  [2002/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Matsuda, Satoru
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Nicholls, Michael John
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Nicholls, Michael John
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date99307729.630.09.1999
[2000/14]
Priority number, dateJP1998027706630.09.1998         Original published format: JP 27706698
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0990978
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/00, G06F3/033
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/14]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Datenverarbeitungsgerät und Verfahren und Rechnerprogramm zur Verwaltung von Objekten eines Raumes in virtueller Realität mit Auras[2000/14]
English:Information processing apparatus, method and computer program for virtual reality object management using auras[2000/14]
French:Dispositif et méthode de traitement de données et programme d'ordinateur de gestion d'objets d'un espace tri-dimensionnel en réalité virtuelle utilisant auras[2000/14]
Examination procedure14.10.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03