Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992838

EP0992838 - Liquid crystal device and liquid crystal display apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.03.2012
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.08.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 12.09.2012  [2012/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2011/18]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ichikawa, Takeshi
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Kurematsu, Katsumi
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Koyama, Osamu
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2000/15]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/15]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date99307740.330.09.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateJP1998028259705.10.1998         Original published format: JP 28259798
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0992838
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0992838
Date:30.01.2002
[2002/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0992838
Date:04.05.2011
Language:EN
[2011/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.12.2001
ClassificationInternational:G02F1/1335, G02F1/13357
[2002/05]
Former International [2000/15]G02F1/1335
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/42]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Flüssigkristall-Anzeigevorrichtung[2000/15]
English:Liquid crystal device and liquid crystal display apparatus[2000/15]
French:Dispositif d'affichage à cristal liquide[2000/15]
Examination procedure28.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/35]
18.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
05.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.11.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.03.2011Fee for grant paid
25.03.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.02.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
19.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
20.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
19.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
02.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
01.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
30.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR30.09.2011
[2012/37]
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0837447  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 7,8,10 * column 25, line 57 - column 29, line 4; figures 19,20B,20C,21; claims 8-17 * [Y] 9;
 [Y]JPH09230321  ;
 [A]EP0833186  (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]) [A] 1-11 * figures 1,2A,2B,5B,18,19A,19B *;
 [A]US5381187  (TAKAMATSU TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * figures 6-8 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01, [Y] 9 * abstract *