Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994603

EP0994603 - Methods and apparatus for random chip delay access priority [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.07.2006
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2008Change - representativepublished on 12.11.2008  [2008/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Chuah, Mooi Choo
184B Eatoncrest Drive
Eatontown, New Jersey 07724 / US
02 / Yue, On-ching
57 Blevins Ave
Middletown, New Jersey 07748 / US
03 / Zhang, Qinqing
301 Middlesex Road
Matawan, New Jersey 07747 / US
 [2005/17]
Former [2000/16]01 / Chuah, Mooi Choo
184B Eatoncrest Drive
Eatontown, New Jersey 07724 / US
02 / Yue, On-ching
57 Blevins Aveee
Middletown, New Jersey 07748 / US
03 / Zhang, Qinqing
301 Middlesex Road
Matawan, New Jersey 07747 / US
Representative(s)Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd
Patent Business
c/o Nokia
125 Finsbury Pavement
London EC2A 1NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/46]Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield
EN3 7XU / GB
Former [2006/09]Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Former [2000/16]Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr.
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB
Application number, filing date99307818.705.10.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateUS1998017249314.10.1998         Original published format: US 172493
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0994603
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0994603
Date:21.11.2001
[2001/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0994603
Date:14.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/28, H04L12/56, H04Q7/32, H04Q7/38
[2001/47]
Former International [2000/16]H04L12/28, H04L12/56, H04Q7/32
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/32]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung für Zugriffspriorität mit Zufall - Chip-Verzögerung[2005/16]
English:Methods and apparatus for random chip delay access priority[2000/16]
French:Procédé et appareil pour priorités d'accès avec retard chip aléatoire[2005/16]
Former [2000/16]Verfahren und Vorrichtung für Zugriffspriorität mit Zutall - Chip-Verzögerung
Former [2000/16]Procédé et appareil pour priorités d'accès avec retard aléatoire de puce
Examination procedure10.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/29]
02.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.06.2005Fee for grant paid
25.06.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
01.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
18.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT14.09.2005
[2008/17]
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE19648077  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [X] 1,11-14,19-23 * page 2, lines 9-13 * * page 2, lines 30,31 * * page 2, lines 50-55 * * page 3, line 33 - page 4, line 5 * [A] 4,6-10;
 [X]US5574728  (MAMAGHANI FARZAN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,11-14,19-23 * column 5, lines 11-57; claims 1,5,8 *;
 [A]US5544196  (TIEDEMANN JR EDWARD G [US], et al) [A] 1-5,9-14,19-23 * column 3, lines 12-44 * * column 4, lines 27-49 * * abstract *;
 [A]  - IERA A ET AL, "TRANSPORT AND CONTROL ISSUES IN MULTIMEDIA WIRELESS NETWORKS", WIRELESS NETWORKS, ACM, US, (19960801), vol. 2, no. 3, ISSN 1022-0038, pages 249 - 261, XP000625343 [A] 17 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01201058