Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992582

EP0992582 - Schistosoma recombinant fusion protein vaccine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.05.2004
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.05.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.07.2004  [2004/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
University Of Wales, Bangor
Cae Derwen, College Road Bangor
Gwynedd LL57 2DG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
University of Wales, Bangor
Cae Derwen, College Road
Bangor, Gwynedd LL57 2DG / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Doenhoff, Michael
University of Wales, Cae Derwen, College Road
Bangor, Gwyned LL57 2DG / GB
02 / Sayers, Jon, Univ. Div. of Molecular and Gen. Med.
M Floor, Royal Hallamshire Hospital
Sheffield S10 2JF / GB
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Brandon, Paul Laurence , et al
Appleyard Lees
15 Clare Road
Halifax, HX1 2HY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Brandon, Paul Laurence , et al
APPLEYARD LEES, 15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
Application number, filing date99307832.805.10.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateGB1998002182107.10.1998         Original published format: GB 9821821
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0992582
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0992582
Date:26.03.2003
[2003/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2003
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/09, A61K39/00, C12N15/62
[2000/15]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2003/51]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Impfstoff bestehend aus rekombinanten Schistosoma Fusions-Protein[2000/15]
English:Schistosoma recombinant fusion protein vaccine[2000/15]
French:Vaccin comprenant une protéine de fusion recombinante de Schistosoma[2000/15]
Examination procedure27.09.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/28]
23.01.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
05.11.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
05.11.2003M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO8809372  (AMRAD CORP LTD [AU]) [Y] 1,2,6-10 * abstract * * page 1, lines 5-12 * * page 4, lines 18-31 * * page 5, lines 30-33 * * page 8, line 25 - page 9, line 2 * * page 9, lines 28-31 *;
 [X]  - PRICE H P ET AL, "Cloning, heterologous expression and antigenicity of a schistosome cercarial protease.", PARASITOLOGY. ENGLAND MAY 1997, (199705), vol. 114 ( Pt 5), ISSN 0031-1820, pages 447 - 453, XP009004658 [X] 1-3,6-9 * abstract * * page 448, column 1, paragraph 3 * * page 449, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 450, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 1; figure 1 * * page 451, column 1, paragraph 3 * * page 452, column 1, paragraph 4 - column 2, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1017/S0031182096008657
 [DY]  - OETTINGER H F ET AL, "RECOMBINANT PEPTIDES AS IMMUNOGENS A COMPARISON OF PROTOCOLS FOR ANTISERA PRODUCTION USING THE PGEX SYSTEM", BIOTECHNIQUES, (1992), vol. 12, no. 4, ISSN 0736-6205, pages 544 - 546, 548-549, XP009004740 [DY] 1,2,6-9 * abstract * * page 544, column 2, paragraph 1 - column 3, paragraph 1 * * page 549, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 2 *
 [Y]  - DOENHOFF M J, "Waksman's postulate, the poor immunogenicity of a larval protease and a vaccine for schistosomiasis.", IMMUNOLOGY, 5th Annual Congress of the British Society for Immunology;Brighton, England, UK; December 2-5, 1997, (199712), vol. 92, no. SUPPL. 1, ISSN 0019-2805, page 55, XP009004662 [Y] 1,2,6-10 * abstract *
 [Y]  - DARANI H Y ET AL, "Schistosoma mansoni: anomalous immunogenic properties of a 27 kDa larval serine protease associated with protective immunity.", PARASITOLOGY. ENGLAND SEP 1997, (199709), vol. 115 ( Pt 3), ISSN 0031-1820, pages 237 - 247, XP009004665 [Y] 1,2,6-9 * abstract * * page 238, column 1, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 244, column 1, paragraphs 1,2 * * page 245, column 1, paragraph 3 - page 246, column 1, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1017/S0031182097001303
 [Y]  - DOENHOFF M J, "A vaccine for schistosomiasis: Alternative approaches.", PARASITOLOGY TODAY, (199803), vol. 14, no. 3, ISSN 0169-4758, pages 105 - 109, XP001122338 [Y] 1,2,6-9 * abstract * * page 105, column 2, paragraph 3 * * page 106, column 1, paragraph 1 - column 2, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0169-4758(97)01204-0
 [A]  - TAYLOR M G ET AL, "Production and testing of Schistosoma japonicum candidate vaccine antigens in the natural ovine host.", VACCINE. ENGLAND AUG 1998, (199808), vol. 16, no. 13, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 1290 - 1298, XP004124596 [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1290, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 1291, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 1295, column 2, paragraph 4 * * page 1296, column 1, paragraph 3 - column 2, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(98)00055-3
 [Y]  - JOHNSON K S ET AL, "VACCINATION AGAINST OVINE CYSTICERCOSIS USING A DEFINED RECOMBINANT ANTIGEN", NATURE, MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD. LONDON, GB, (19890413), vol. 338, no. 6216, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 585 - 587, XP000025363 [Y] 1,2,6-10 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/338585a0
 [Y]  - TROTTEIN F ET AL, "INTER-SPECIES VARIATION OF SCHISTOSOME 28-KDA GLUTATHIONE S-TRANSFERASES", MOLECULAR AND BIOCHEMICAL PARASITOLOGY, (1992), vol. 54, no. 1, ISSN 0166-6851, pages 63 - 72, XP009004794 [Y] 1,2,6-10 * abstract * * page 63, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 69, column 1, paragraph 3 - column 2, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0166-6851(92)90095-2