Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993091

EP0993091 - Circuit breaker [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.03.2007
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.05.2007  [2007/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
Hitachi Techno Engineering Co., Ltd.
13-17, Nakagawa-4-chome Adachi-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
HITACHI, LTD.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
Hitachi Techno Engineering Co., Ltd.
13-17, Nakagawa-4-chome
Adachi-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hayakawa, Hideki
1782-1, Oide, Nakajomachi
Kitakanbara-gun, Niigata-ken / JP
02 / Sato, Eietsu
Tsutsujigaoka, Nakajomachi
Kitakanbara-gun, Niigata-ken / JP
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Calderbank, Thomas Roger , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Calderbank, Thomas Roger , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date99307858.306.10.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateJP1998028378606.10.1998         Original published format: JP 28378698
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0993091
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0993091
Date:02.10.2002
[2002/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:H02H1/06
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/26]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schutzschalter[2000/15]
English:Circuit breaker[2000/15]
French:Disjoncteur[2000/15]
Examination procedure26.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/15]
18.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.08.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/18]
06.10.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
22.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
22.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
24.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200608   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0778645  (EATON CORP [US]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 35; figure . *