blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0999294 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0999294



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 130
24.09.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
24.03.2004 Closing of application Search / examination 1
10.12.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) Search / examination 1
17.06.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
17.06.2003 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
17.06.2003 Text intended for grant Search / examination 14
04.04.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
04.04.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
04.04.2003 Description Search / examination 4
04.04.2003 Description Search / examination 3
04.04.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.02.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
04.02.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.02.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.10.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
08.10.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.12.2001 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
13.11.2000 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
06.11.2000 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
06.11.2000 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
16.05.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
29.03.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
25.02.2000 Annex Search / examination 1
25.02.2000 Miscellaneous requests for changes concerning the applicant Search / examination 1
16.02.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
16.02.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
16.02.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
13.01.2000 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.01.2000 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
22.12.1999 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.12.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.12.1999 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
26.11.1999 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
15.11.1999 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 2
15.11.1999 Priority document Search / examination 22
15.11.1999 Priority document Search / examination 24
07.10.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
07.10.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
07.10.1999 Description Search / examination 9
07.10.1999 Drawings Search / examination 2
07.10.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
07.10.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6