blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0999294


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
26.03.2004 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  12.05.2004  [2004/20]
05.12.2003 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
28.11.2003 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
23.10.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.06.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
10.04.2003 Examination report or reply
05.02.2003 Examination report or reply
07.11.2002 Renewal fee
04.10.2002 First examination report
02.10.2002 Examination report or reply
27.04.2002 Surcharge for renewal fee
27.04.2002 Renewal fee
04.12.2001 Surcharge for renewal fee
01.02.2001 Change - extension states
08.12.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  24.01.2001 [2001/04]
17.11.2000 Request for examination filed published on  03.01.2001 [2001/01]
24.03.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.05.2000 [2000/19]