Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0999294
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB2342359 04.06.2003B
GB2342359 12.04.2000A
GB9910075D 30.06.1999D0
Priority number Date
GB9822048 10.10.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB9822048D 02.12.1998D0
Priority number Date
GB9822048 10.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2000119890Global Dossier 25.04.2000A
Priority number Date
GB9822048 10.10.1998
GB9910075 04.05.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0999294Global Dossier 10.05.2000A1
Priority number Date
GB9822048 10.10.1998
GB9910075 04.05.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6165331 26.12.2000A
Priority number Date
GB9822048 10.10.1998
GB9910075 04.05.1999