Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0999294

EP0999294 - Bipolar metal electrode and electrolyser therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.03.2004
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.05.2004  [2004/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cumberland Electrochemical Limited
108-114 Derby Road Bootle
Merseyside L20 1BR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/19]For all designated states
Cumberland Electrochemical Limited
108-114 Derby Road
Bootle, Merseyside L20 1BR / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Hughes, David Anthony
11 Kingsway
Frodsham, Cheshire WA6 6RU / GB
[2000/19]
Representative(s)WP Thompson
8th Floor
1 Mann Island
Liverpool L3 1BP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/19]W.P. Thompson & Co.
Coopers Building, Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
Application number, filing date99307897.107.10.1999
[2000/19]
Priority number, dateGB1998002204810.10.1998         Original published format: GB 9822048
GB1999001007504.05.1999         Original published format: GB 9910075
[2000/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0999294
Date:10.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:C25B9/00, C25B9/04, C25B1/26
[2000/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/19]
TitleGerman:Bipolare Metallelektrode und damit ausgestatteter Elektrolyseur[2000/19]
English:Bipolar metal electrode and electrolyser therewith[2000/19]
French:Electrode métallique bipolaire et électrolyseur la comprenant[2000/19]
Examination procedure06.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/01]
08.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/20]
10.12.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200103   M06   Fee paid on   12.04.2002
Documents cited:Search[A]US4568434  (MORRIS GREGORY J E [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 8, line 47 - line 52 * * column 9, line 29 - line 51 * * column 11, line 19 - line 20 *;
 [A]US3899409  (SCHULTZ ROBERT F, et al) [A] 1 * column 4 - column 5; claims 1-6 *;
 [A]CA1231918  (CANADIAN IND) [A] 1 * page 6 *;
 [A]FR2164454  (PECHINEY SAINT GOBAIN)