blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0994463 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0994463



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 89
10.09.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
05.03.2003 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
24.01.2003 Confirmation of withdrawal of application/closure of proceedings Search / examination 1
17.01.2003 Final instructions in case of withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
17.01.2003 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
13.01.2003 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
24.01.2002 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
31.12.2001 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 28
08.03.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
08.10.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
08.10.1999 Claims Search / examination 5
08.10.1999 Description Search / examination 11
08.10.1999 Drawings Search / examination 3
08.10.1999 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
08.10.1999 Priority document Search / examination 26
08.10.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6