blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0994463


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
07.02.2003 Change - withdrawal published on  26.03.2003  [2003/13]
17.01.2003 Withdrawal of application published on  05.03.2003  [2003/10]
23.10.2002 Renewal fee
25.01.2002 Change - applicant published on  13.03.2002  [2002/11]
18.10.2001 Renewal fee
03.03.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]