blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0994463
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2000122695Global Dossier 28.04.2000A
Priority number Date
GB9822347 13.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0994463Global Dossier 19.04.2000A2
Priority number Date
GB9822347 13.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GB2342829 26.03.2003B
GB2342829 19.04.2000A
GB9822347D 09.12.1998D0
Priority number Date
GB9822347 13.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6629068 30.09.2003B1
Priority number Date
GB9822347 13.10.1998