Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994463

EP0994463 - Post filter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  07.02.2003
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.02.2003Change - withdrawalpublished on 26.03.2003  [2003/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
[2002/11]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD.
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / Black, Alastair
110 Oakhill, Woodstreet Village
Guildford, Surrey GU3 3ES / GB
02 / Horos, Jacek
81 Ryves Avenue
Yateley, Hampshire GU46 6FB / GB
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace , et al
Nokia IPR Department
Nokia House
Summit Avenue
Farnborough
Hampshire GU14 0NG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace , et al
Nokia IPR Department Nokia House, Summit Avenue, Southwood
Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 0NG / GB
Application number, filing date99307954.008.10.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateGB1998002234713.10.1998         Original published format: GB 9822347
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0994463
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
ClassificationInternational:G10L19/14
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/16]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Postfilter[2000/16]
English:Post filter[2000/16]
French:Postfiltre[2000/16]
Examination procedure13.01.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/10]
13.01.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04