Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1004683

EP1004683 - Bearing material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.04.2005
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.06.2005  [2005/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DANA CORPORATION
4500 Dorr Street, P.O. Box 1000
Toledo, OH 43697 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
DANA CORPORATION
4500 Dorr Street, P.O. Box 1000
Toledo, OH 43697 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Lyon, John
c/o Dana Glacier Vandervell Europe, Riccarton
Kilmarnock, Ayrshire, KA1 3NA / GB
02 / Rutherford, Fatima
c/o Dana Glacier Vandervell Europe, Riccarton
Kilmarnock, Ayrshire, KA1 3NA / GB
[2000/22]
Representative(s)Goddard, David John , et al
Harrison Goddard Foote LLP
4th Floor, Merchant Exchange
17-19 Whitworth Street West
Manchester M1 5WG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]Goddard, David John , et al
Harrison Goddard Foote, 1 Stockport Road, Marple
Stockport SK6 6BD / GB
Application number, filing date99307969.808.10.1999
[2000/22]
Priority number, dateGB1998002334927.10.1998         Original published format: GB 9823349
[2000/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1004683
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1004683
Date:09.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:C22C13/00, F16C33/12
[2000/22]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/07]
Former [2000/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Lagerwerkstoff[2000/22]
English:Bearing material[2000/22]
French:Matériau pour un palier[2000/22]
Examination procedure16.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/02]
01.12.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
04.04.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
31.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
14.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.04.2004Fee for grant paid
07.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
15.01.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
15.01.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
15.01.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
15.01.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
15.01.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
15.01.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
15.01.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
15.01.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
15.01.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
15.01.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
15.01.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
15.01.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
15.01.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH10180480  ;
 [X]US3573008  (AKIN ROBERT M JR) [X] 1-3 * column 4, line 73 - line 76 *;
 [X]EP0254355  (AE PLC [GB]) [X] 1-8 * column 5, line 11 - line 14; claim 2 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981031), vol. 1998, no. 12, [X] 1-3 * abstract *
Examination   - BARRY B.T.K.; THWAITES C.J., Tin and its Alloys and Compounds, UK, ELLIS HORWOOD LTD, (1983),