Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994079

EP0994079 - Method and apparatus for forming single-glass and dual-glass fibers and an insulation product formed from such fibers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.06.2003
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.08.2003  [2003/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OWENS CORNING
One Owens Corning Parkway Toledo
Ohio 43659 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
OWENS CORNING
One Owens Corning Parkway
Toledo, Ohio 43659 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Watton, William A.
12821 Jeffrey Drive
Pickerington, Ohio 43147 / US
02 / Houpt, Ronald A.
1001 Tall Tree Court
Westerville, Ohio 43081 / US
03 / Potter, Russell M.
5573 Lancaster Road
Hebron, Ohio 43025 / US
04 / Berdan, Clarke
1878 Hankinson Road
Granville, Ohio 43023 / US
05 / Aschenbeck, David P.
476 Granville Road
Newark, Ohio 43055 / US
[2000/16]
Representative(s)West, Alan Harry , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]West, Alan Harry , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date99307982.111.10.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateUS1998017042213.10.1998         Original published format: US 170422
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0994079
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0994079
Date:15.11.2000
[2000/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:C03B37/04, C03B37/075, D04H3/00, D04H3/08, D04H3/16, D02G1/18
[2000/46]
Former International [2000/16]C03B37/04, C03B37/075, D04H3/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/31]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Einzel- oder Doppelglas-Fasern und mittels solcher Fasern hergestelltes Isolationsprodukt[2000/16]
English:Method and apparatus for forming single-glass and dual-glass fibers and an insulation product formed from such fibers[2000/16]
French:Procédé et appareil pour la fabrication de fibres en verre de même composition et de composition double et produit isolant formé par ces fibres[2000/16]
Examination procedure15.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/06]
20.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/32]
06.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9529882  (OWENS CORNING FIBERGLASS CORP [US]) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9609257  (OWENS CORNING FIBERGLASS CORP [US]) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *