Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995791

EP0995791 - Polymer compositions and a method of promoting soil release from fabrics using said polymer compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.12.2004
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 16.12.2009  [2009/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY
100 Independence Mall West
Philadelphia, PA 19106-2399 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY
100 Independence Mall West
Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19106-2399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Shulman, Jan Edward
8 Hibiscus Place
Newtown, Pennsylvania 18940 / US
02 / Kirk, Thomas Cleveland
861 Sackettsford Road
Ivyland, Pennsylvania 18974 / US
03 / Swift, Graham
215 Winged Foot Drive
Blue Bell, Pennsylvania 19442 / US
04 / Schwartz, Curtis
437 Edgewood Drive
Ambler, Pennsylvania 19002 / US
05 / Creamer, Marianne Patricia
1827 Buttonwood Way
Warrington, Pennsylvania 18976 / US
06 / Falcone, Beth Anne
2723 Castle Drive
Bensalem, Pennsylvania 19020 / US
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Kent, Venetia Katherine , et al
Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell
Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/51]Kent, Venetia Katherine , et al
Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell
Derbyshire DE 45 1DZ / GB
Former [2004/17]Kent, Venetia Katherine , et al
Rohm and Haas (UK) Ltd., European Patent Department, 28th Floor, City Point, One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9HS / GB
Former [2000/17]Buckley, Guy Julian , et al
ROHM AND HAAS (UK) LTD. European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue
Croydon CR9 3NB / GB
Application number, filing date99308001.911.10.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateUS19980105176P22.10.1998         Original published format: US 105176 P
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0995791
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0995791
Date:18.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:C11D3/37, C11D3/00
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/02]
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Polymerzusammensetzungen und Verfahren zur Schmutzlösen-Förderung von Geweben unter Verwendung dieser Polymerzusammensetzungen[2000/17]
English:Polymer compositions and a method of promoting soil release from fabrics using said polymer compositions[2000/17]
French:Compositions polymériques et méthode favorisant l'élimination des salissures du linge au moyen desdites compositions polymériques[2000/17]
Examination procedure22.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/17]
19.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
17.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.12.2003Fee for grant paid
04.12.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.11.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL18.02.2004
ES29.05.2004
[2005/05]
Former [2004/46]ES29.05.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0324568  (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 1-6,9,12 * page 4, line 1 - line 6; example 31; claims 1-15; tables II-VII *;
 [D]US4797223  (AMICK DAVID R [US], et al);
 [X]US3993830  (DICKSON ROBERT E, et al) [X] 1-3,6,10 * column 2, line 6 - line 15 * * column 3, line 67 - column 4, line 26; examples III-VIII *;
 [X]EP0786516  (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-4,6,9,12 * example 9; claims 1,10,11,14 *;
 [X]EP0786514  (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8,12 * examples 1-3,8; claims 1,9,10,12 *;
 [X]EP0543562  (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 1-4,13 * claim -; table - *