Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994236

EP0994236 - Indexing mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.06.2006
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.06.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.07.2006  [2006/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pilot Drilling Control Limited
Sandings, Broad View Road, Oulton Broad Lowestoft
Suffolk NR32 3PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
Pilot Drilling Control Limited
Sandings, Broad View Road, Oulton Broad
Lowestoft, Suffolk NR32 3PL / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Swietlik, George
Sandings, Broad View Road, Oulton Broad
Lowestoft, Suffolk NR32 3PL / GB
02 / Abbott, Malcolm Adrian
25 Rectory Street
Halesworth, Suffolk IP19 8AE / GB
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Giles, Ashley Simon , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]Giles, Ashley Simon , et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Former [2000/27]Giles, Ashley Simon , et al
Haseltine Lake & Co. Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Former [2000/16]Jones, Michael Raymond , et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date99308013.412.10.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateGB1998002221112.10.1998         Original published format: GB 9822211
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0994236
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0994236
Date:21.03.2001
[2001/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.01.2001
ClassificationInternational:E21B23/04, E21B23/00, E21B21/10, E21B17/10, E21B7/06
[2000/48]
Former International [2000/16]E21B23/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/50]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Indexiervorrichtung[2000/16]
English:Indexing mechanism[2000/16]
French:Mécanisme d'indexation[2000/16]
Examination procedure13.08.2001Examination requested  [2001/41]
22.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.02.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/30]
10.03.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
29.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
27.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200507   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9831915  (BERGH JOHANNES W H DEN) [X] 1,2,7,9,13-15 * page 2, line 25 - page 3, line 5; figure 4 * [Y] 3-6,12,18,23;
 [Y]EP0369745  (KICK SUB INC) [Y] 3 * column 6, line 52 - column 7, line 55; figure 6 *;
 [Y]US4355685  (BECK HAROLD K) [Y] 4-6,12 * column 5, line 15 - line 58; figure 1C *;
 [Y]US5443128  (AMAUDRIC DU CHAFFAUT BENOIT) [Y] 23 * column 5, line 39 - line 46; figure 2 *;
 [E]GB2336171  (DRESSER IND) [E] 1,3,9,13-15,18 * Abstract; page 16, line 23 - line 26; figures 4,14 *;
 [A]GB2314106  (RED BARON) [A] 1,15 * figures 1,3; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5529126  (EDWARDS JEFFREY C) [A] 1,15 * column 3, line 1 - line 5; figure 4B * * column 4, line 25 - line 35 * * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 1 *;
 [X]EP0802304  (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERV INC) [X] 16,17 * figure 1; claims 1,2 *;
 [A]US4298077  (EMERY MAURICE M) [A] 16,17 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 27; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]WO9812413  (WEATHERFORD LAMB (US)) [A] 16,17 * page 16, line 31 - page 17, line 4; figure 3 *;
 [A]WO9721020  (RED BARON OIL TOOLS RENTAL ;MCGARIAN BRUCE (GB); TULLOCH RORY MCCR) [A] 16,17 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]GB2256884  (PBL DRILLING TOOLS LIMITED) [A] 16,17 * Abstract;; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]US4491187  (RUSSELL LARRY R) [Y] 18 * column 1, line 33 - column 2, line 4; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4844178  (CENDRE ANDRE ET AL) [A] 18 * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 8; figure 2 *;
 [A]US4754821  (SWIETLIK GEORGE) [A] 18 * column 4, line 20 - line 35; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5339914  (LEE PAUL) [A] 18 * column 6, line 13 - line 42; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5452772  (VAN DEN BERGH JOHANNES W H) [A] 18,19,21 * column 12, line 45 - column 13, line 26; figure 8 *;
 [A]US5467834  (HUGHES W JAMES ET AL) [A] 19,21 * column 9, line 10 - line 51; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US5421421  (APPLETON ROBERT P) [A] 19,21 * column 4, line 43 - column 5, line 17; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5547031  (WARREN TOMMY M ET AL) [A] 19,21 * Abstract;; figures 1,3 *