Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994627

EP0994627 - Regulation of the computational and memory requirements of a compressed bitstream in a video decoder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.01.2007
Database last updated on 18.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 23.12.2009  [2009/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2006/10]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Ohaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tan, Thiow Keng
Block 135, Serangoon Avenue No. 09-16
Singapore 556114 / SG
02 / Hu, Guo Rong
210 San Antonio Circle No. 225
Mountain View, CA 94040 / US
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Haley, Stephen , et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/52]Haley, Stephen , et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [2007/07]Haley, Stephen , et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [2007/04]Finnie, Peter John , et al
Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [2000/16]Rackham, Stephen Neil
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date99308021.712.10.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateJP1998032876713.10.1998         Original published format: JP 32876798
JP1999004140619.02.1999         Original published format: JP 4140699
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0994627
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0994627
Date:26.07.2000
[2000/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0994627
Date:08.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/26, H04N7/50
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/15]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Regelung des Rechen- und Speicheraufwands zur Datenfolgekompression in einem Videodekoder[2000/16]
English:Regulation of the computational and memory requirements of a compressed bitstream in a video decoder[2000/16]
French:Régulation des besoins en calcul et mémoire d'un flux de bits dans un decodeur vidéo[2000/16]
Examination procedure27.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/09]
24.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
10.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
15.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
13.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.09.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.12.2005Fee for grant paid
21.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]US5677969  (AUYEUNG CHEUNG [US], et al) [A] 1-34 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9617492  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-34 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5719632  (HOANG DZUNG TIEN [US], et al) [A] 1-34 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5038209  (HANG HSUEH-MING [US]) [A] 1-34 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9747139  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-34 * the whole document *