Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994522

EP0994522 - Lithium polymer battery [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.09.2005
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.09.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.11.2005  [2005/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Display Devices Co., Ltd.
575, Shin-dong, Paldal-ku Suwon-City
Kyungki-do 445-970 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
Samsung Display Devices Co., Ltd.
575, Shin-dong, Paldal-ku
Suwon-City, Kyungki-do 445-970 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Chang, Youn-han
Samsung Display Devices, 575 Shin-dong, Padal-gu
Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR
02 / Kim, Jung-ho
Samsung Display Devices, 575 Shin-dong, Padal-gu
Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Ertl, Nicholas Justin
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Ertl, Nicholas Justin
Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date99308071.213.10.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateKR1998004271113.10.1998         Original published format: KR 9842711
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0994522
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0994522
Date:19.09.2001
[2001/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01M10/40, H01M4/74, H01M4/66, H01M4/70
[2001/38]
Former International [2000/16]H01M10/40, H01M4/74, H01M4/66
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/23]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Lithium-Polymer Batterie[2000/16]
English:Lithium polymer battery[2000/16]
French:Batterie lithium à polymère[2000/16]
Examination procedure06.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/05]
11.05.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/45]
07.06.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0647974  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1-4 * page 2, line 1 - line 2 * * page 4, line 20 - line 30 * * page 8, line 20 - line 24 * * example 1 *;
 [A]US5552239  (GOZDZ ANTONI S [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 3, line 20 - line 30 * * example 2 *;
 [A]EP0849819  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2,4 * column 3, line 39 - line 57 * * column 11, line 47 - column 12, line 54 *;
 [A]EP0762521  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4 * page 6, line 39 - page 7, line 14 * * page 8, line 15 - line 21 * * page 10, line 14 - line 30 *;
 [A]EP0777287  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,3,4 * page 6, line 2 - line 12 *