Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994248

EP0994248 - Fuel injector with rate shaping control through piezoelectric nozzle lift [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.10.2005
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CATERPILLAR INC.
100 N.E. Adams Street
Peoria IL 61629-6490 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
CATERPILLAR INC.
100 Northeast Adams Street
Peoria Illinois 61629-6490 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Shinogle, Ronald D.
1023 W. Centennial Dr.
Peoria, Illinois 61614 / US
02 / Rajagopalan, Senthilkumar
6 Keisha Dr., Apt. 2
Bloomington, Illinois 616104 / US
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Wagner, Karl H. , et al
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Wagner, Karl H. , et al
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2001/46]Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Wagner & Geyer, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2000/16]Brunner, Michael John
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date99308085.213.10.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateUS1998017042013.10.1998         Original published format: US 170420
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0994248
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0994248
Date:09.05.2001
[2001/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0994248
Date:08.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:F02M45/08, F02M45/12, F02M47/02, F02M59/46
[2001/19]
Former International [2000/16]F02M45/08, F02M45/12, F02M47/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT [2002/05]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Brennstoffeinspritzventil mit piezoelektrischer Einspritzverlaufregelung[2000/16]
English:Fuel injector with rate shaping control through piezoelectric nozzle lift[2000/16]
French:Injecteur de combustible avec commande piezoélectrique du taux d'injection[2000/16]
Examination procedure08.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/02]
15.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.08.2004Fee for grant paid
30.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.03.2004Date of oral proceedings
13.04.2004Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
07.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
06.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
06.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT08.12.2004
[2008/17]
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0826876  (ISUZU MOTORS LTD [JP]) [X] 1-12 * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 13; figure - * * column 8, line 44 - column 11, line 20 *;
 [X]US5694903  (GANSER MARCO A [CH]) [X] 1-12 * column 4, line 15 - column 5, line 37 * * column 9, line 14 - line 19; figure - *;
 [E]EP0971119  (ISUZU MOTORS LTD [JP]) [E] 1-12 * page 5, line 48 - page 9, line 23; figures 3-5,8,11 *;
 [X]US4720077  (MINOURA MIKIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,12 * figure - *;
 [X]JPS61271881
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870421), vol. 011, no. 127, Database accession no. (E - 501), [X] 1-3,5,7,12 * abstract *