Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994443

EP0994443 - Rendering of surfaces from volumetric data employing both dividing and stretching cubes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.11.2007
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 29.07.2009  [2009/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Ludke, Siegwalt
10 Dawn Drive
Scotia, New York 12302 / US
02 / Cline, Harvey Ellis
845 Harris Drive
Schenectady, new York 12309 / US
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Goode, Ian Roy , et al
London Patent Operation
General Electric International, Inc.
15 John Adam Street
London
WC2N 6LU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/31]Goode, Ian Roy , et al
London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London
WC2N 6LU / GB
Former [2000/16]Goode, Ian Roy , et al
GE LONDON PATENT OPERATION, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street
London WC2R 3AA / GB
Application number, filing date99308106.614.10.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateUS1998017333215.10.1998         Original published format: US 173332
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0994443
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0994443
Date:17.07.2002
[2002/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0994443
Date:27.12.2006
Language:EN
[2006/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.06.2002
ClassificationInternational:G06T15/20
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   NL [2003/15]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Oberflächensichtbarmachung aus volumetrischen Daten unter Verwendung von Würfelteilung und -Streckung[2000/16]
English:Rendering of surfaces from volumetric data employing both dividing and stretching cubes[2000/16]
French:Rendu de surfaces à partir de données volumétriques utilisant à la fois la division et l'étirage de cubes[2000/16]
Examination procedure17.01.2003Examination requested  [2003/13]
15.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.11.2006Fee for grant paid
02.11.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.09.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
02.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
31.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
31.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]DE4034086  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,6 * column 5, line 5 - line 47 *;
 [A]US5331552  (LLOYD ROBERT F [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * column 4, line 41 - line 68 *
 [A]  HAKAN ANCIN ET AL, "AN IMPROVED WATERSHED ALGORITHM FOR COUNTING OBJECTS IN NOISY, ANISOTROPIC 3-D BIOLOGICAL IMAGES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING. (ICIP). WASHINGTON, OCT. 23 - 26, 1995, LOS ALAMITOS, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, US, (19951023), vol. 3, ISBN 0-7803-3122-2, pages 172 - 175, XP000623127 [A] 1-7 * the whole document *