Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993901

EP0993901 - Apparatus for assembling heat exchanger cores [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.04.2003
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.04.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.05.2003  [2003/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FORD MOTOR COMPANY
The American Road
Dearborn, MI 48126 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
Ford Motor Company
The American Road
Dearborn, MI 48126 / US
Inventor(s)01 / McIntosh, Douglas James
5889 North Territoral
Ann Arbor, Michigan 48105 / US
02 / Crutchfield, Thomas Steven
352 South Melborn
Dearborn, Michigan 48124 / US
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Messulam, Alec Moses , et al
Harrison IP Limited
3 Ebor House
London Ebor Business Park
Millfield Lane
Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Messulam, Alec Moses , et al
A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway
Leigh-on-Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB
Application number, filing date99308171.018.10.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateUS1998017364716.10.1998         Original published format: US 173647
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993901
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:B23P15/26, B21D53/08
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/01]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Zusammenbauen von Wärmetauscherkernen[2000/16]
English:Apparatus for assembling heat exchanger cores[2000/16]
French:Procédé pour assembler des noyaux d' échangeurs de chaleur[2000/16]
Examination procedure26.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/43]
03.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.11.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/21]
20.12.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DA]US4611375  (ZAPAWA JOHN J [US]) [DA] 1,7-10 * figure -; claim - *;
 [DA]US5014422  (WALLIS BERNARD J [US]) [DA] 1,8-10 * column 2, line 39 - line 51; figure -; claims 1,4 *;
 [A]JPS6125734  ;
 [A]JPS59197329
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860620), vol. 010, no. 176, Database accession no. (M - 491), [A] 1,5,8-10 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850320), vol. 009, no. 063, Database accession no. (M - 365), [A] 1,9,10 * abstract *
by applicantUS4611375
 US5014422