Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1000948

EP1000948 - Copper containing substituted phenylethylene precursor and synthesis method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.07.2003
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.08.2003  [2003/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22 Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka 545-8522 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/20]For all designated states
SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA
22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka 545-8522 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Zhuang, Wei Wei
2404 SE 161st, V-164
Vancouver, WA 98683 / US
02 / NGuyen, Tue
1603 SE 171st Place
Vancouver, WA 98683 / US
03 / Charneski, Lawrence J.
8115 NE 227th Avenue
Vancouver, WA 98682 / US
04 / Evans, David R.
7574 SW 179th
Beaverton, OR 97007 / US
05 / Hsu, Sheng Teng
2216 NW Trout Court
Camas, WA 98607 / US
[2000/20]
Representative(s)West, Alan Harry
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/20]West, Alan Harry
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date99308237.919.10.1999
[2000/20]
Priority number, dateUS1998021009911.12.1998         Original published format: US 210099
US19980107892P10.11.1998         Original published format: US 107892 P
[2000/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1000948
Date:17.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1000948
Date:24.05.2000
[2000/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1000948
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07F1/08, C23C16/18
[2000/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/12]
Former [2001/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  LI 
Former [2000/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kupferhaltige substituierte Phenylethylenvorläuferverbindung und Verfahren zur Herstellung[2000/20]
English:Copper containing substituted phenylethylene precursor and synthesis method[2000/20]
French:Précurseurs à base de phénylethylène substitué et cuivre, et procédé pour le préparer[2000/20]
Examination procedure06.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
25.11.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
26.04.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
21.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2002Fee for grant paid
27.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
12.02.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
12.02.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
12.02.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
12.02.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
12.02.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
12.02.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
12.02.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
12.02.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
12.02.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
12.02.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
12.02.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
12.02.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
12.02.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
12.02.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
12.02.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DA]US5085731  (NORMAN JOHN A T [US], et al) [DA] 1 * column W *;
 [A]  DOYLE, G. ET AL., "alkene and carbon monoxide derivatives of copper(I) and silver(I) .beta.-diketonates", ORGANOMETALLICS, (1985), vol. 4, no. 5, pages 830 - 835, XP000892470 [A] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/om00124a005