Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995365

EP0995365 - Separable buckle with hook [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.06.2003
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.08.2003  [2003/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Evenflo Company, Inc.
Northwoods Business Center II, 707 Crossroads Court Vandalia
Ohio 45377 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
Evenflo Company, Inc.
Northwoods Business Center II, 707 Crossroads Court
Vandalia, Ohio 45377 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Fair, Paul
2781 S. Lafayette St.
Denver, Colorado 80210 / US
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Asquith, Julian Peter , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Fletcher House
Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park
Oxford OX4 4GE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Asquith, Julian Peter , et al
Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South
Oxford OX4 2RU / GB
Application number, filing date99308246.019.10.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateUS1998017589920.10.1998         Original published format: US 175899
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0995365
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:A44B11/28
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/02]
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Trennbare Schnalle mit einem Hakenelement[2000/17]
English:Separable buckle with hook[2000/17]
French:Boucle séparable à crochet[2000/17]
Examination procedure20.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/51]
26.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/33]
13.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2302561  (ARJO LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * figures 1-3; claims 1-8 *;
 [A]USB532476I  (WATERBURY BUCKLE COMPANY) [A] 1 * column 2, line 25 - column 4, line 6; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]GB1014943  (GQ PARACHUTE COMP LTD) [A] 1 * page 1, line 20 - page 2, line 9; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US4443916  (TIEMANN JAMES P [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 65 - column 5, line 21; figures 1-6 *