Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1003122

EP1003122 - Input device for game machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.07.2004
Database last updated on 15.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.08.2004  [2004/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
1-7 Yukigaya Otsuka-cho Ota-ku
Tokyo 145 / JP
Former [2000/21]For all designated states
1-7 Yukigaya Otsuka-cho
Ota-ku Tokyo 145 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Soma, Masahiro
1-5-1 Izumitamatsuyu
Iwaki-shi, Fukushima-ken / JP
Representative(s)Kensett, John Hinton
Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford
WD18 0JU / GB
Former [2000/21]Kensett, John Hinton
Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road
Watford, Hertfordshire WD1 7HE / GB
Application number, filing date99308342.722.10.1999
Priority number, dateJP1998031379604.11.1998         Original published format: JP 31379698
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
Type: A3 Search report 
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:G06K11/18, A63F13/06
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/07]
Former [2000/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Eingabevorrichtung für eine Spielmachine[2000/21]
English:Input device for game machine[2000/21]
French:Dispositif d'entrée de données pour machine de jeu[2000/21]
Examination procedure16.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/33]
26.06.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/35]
18.03.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
10.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
16.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XA]US4469330  (ASHER JAMES C [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 19; figures 1,5 * [A] 3,7;
 [A]US5716274  (GOTO TEIYU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US5531443  (CRUZ JOSE L [PR]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970630), vol. 1997, no. 6, [A] 7 * abstract *