Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0996023

EP0996023 - Progressive addition lenses [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  05.03.2010
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.03.2010Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 07.04.2010  [2010/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL (COMPAGNIE GENERALE D'OPTIQUE)
147, rue de Paris
94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR
[N/P]
Former [2010/14]For all designated states
ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL (COMPAGNIE GENERALE D'OPTIQUE)
147, Rue de Paris
94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR
Former [2006/13]For all designated states
ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL (COMPAGNIE GENERALE D'OPTIQUE)
147 rue de Paris
94220 Charenton le Pont / FR
Former [2006/01]For all designated states
Johnson & Johnson Vision Care, Inc.
4500 Salisbury Road, Suite 300
Jacksonville, FL 32216 / US
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
JOHNSON & JOHNSON VISION PRODUCTS, INC.
4500 Salisbury Road, Suite 300
Jacksonville, Florida 32216 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Menezes, Edgar V.
6558 Hidden Woods Drive
Roanoke, VA 24018 / US
02 / Merritt, James S.
10557 Little Catawba Creek Road
Troutville, VA 24175 / US
03 / Kokonaski, William
6173 Burnham Road
Roanoke, VA 24018 / US
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Vignesoult, Serge L. M. , et al
Cabinet Plasseraud
52, Rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vignesoult, Serge L. M. , et al
Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2006/18]Vignesoult, Serge L. M. , et al
Cabinet Plasseraud 65/67, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2006/08]de Mareüil-Villette, Caroline
Cabinet Plasseraud 65/67, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2000/17]Mercer, Christopher Paul
Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date99308360.922.10.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateUS1998017847123.10.1998         Original published format: US 178471
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0996023
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0996023
Date:13.09.2000
[2000/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0996023
Date:11.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/50]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0996023
Date:07.04.2010
Language:EN
[2010/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:G02C7/02
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/17]
TitleGerman:Progressive Brillengläser[2001/35]
English:Progressive addition lenses[2000/17]
French:Lentilles à addition progressive[2000/17]
Former [2000/17]Progressive Additionslinsen
Examination procedure23.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/17]
12.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
20.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
18.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.06.2002Fee for grant paid
19.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.09.2003  14.10.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Rodenstock GmbH
Isartalstr. 43
80469 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Rocke, Carsten
Müller-Boré & Partner
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
 02  11.09.2003  01.09.2005  WITHDRAWN
Essilor International (Cie Générale d'Optique)
1 Rue Thomas Edison Echat 902
F-94028 Créteil Cedex / FR
Opponent's representative
Hofmann, Harald
Sonnenberg Fortmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Herzogspitalstrasse 10a
80331 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2005/44]
Opponent(s)01  11.09.2003  14.10.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Rodenstock GmbH
Isartalstr. 43
80469 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Rocke, Carsten
Müller-Boré & Partner Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
 02  11.09.2003  01.09.2005  WITHDRAWN
Essilor International (Cie Générale d'Optique)
1 Rue Thomas Edison Echat 902
F-94028 Créteil Cedex / FR
Opponent's representative
Hofmann, Harald
Sonnenberg Fortmann, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Herzogspitalstrasse 10a
80331 München / DE
Former [2003/46]
Opponent(s)01  11.09.2003   
Rodenstock GmbH
Isartalstr. 43
80469 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Rocke, Carsten
Müller-Boré & Partner Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
 02  11.09.2003   
Essilor International (Cie Générale d'Optique)
1 Rue Thomas Edison Echat 902
F-94028 Créteil Cedex / FR
Opponent's representative
Hofmann, Harald
Sonnenberg Fortmann, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Herzogspitalstrasse 10a
80331 München / DE
21.10.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.05.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.06.2004Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06)
21.12.2004Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
26.06.2006Date of oral proceedings
14.07.2006Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.10.2006Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
29.12.2006Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.01.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
15.02.2010Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition19.12.2006Appeal received No.  T1763/06
16.02.2007Statement of grounds filed
15.09.2009Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
10.11.2006Appeal received No.  T1763/06
15.09.2009Date of oral proceedings
21.09.2009Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.12.2002
CH11.12.2002
FI11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
LI11.12.2002
DK11.03.2003
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
ES27.06.2003
CY22.10.2003
LU22.10.2003
MC31.10.2003
BE31.10.2006
NL01.05.2007
IT22.10.2008
[2010/06]
Former [2008/17]AT11.12.2002
CH11.12.2002
FI11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
LI11.12.2002
DK11.03.2003
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
ES27.06.2003
CY22.10.2003
LU22.10.2003
MC31.10.2003
NL01.05.2007
Former [2005/02]AT11.12.2002
CH11.12.2002
FI11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
LI11.12.2002
DK11.03.2003
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
ES27.06.2003
CY22.10.2003
LU22.10.2003
MC31.10.2003
Former [2004/39]AT11.12.2002
CH11.12.2002
FI11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
LI11.12.2002
DK11.03.2003
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
ES27.06.2003
CY22.10.2003
LU22.10.2003
Former [2004/36]AT11.12.2002
CH11.12.2002
FI11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
LI11.12.2002
DK11.03.2003
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
ES27.06.2003
CY22.10.2003
Former [2004/05]AT11.12.2002
CH11.12.2002
FI11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
LI11.12.2002
DK11.03.2003
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
ES27.06.2003
Former [2004/02]AT11.12.2002
CH11.12.2002
FI11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
LI11.12.2002
DK11.03.2003
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
Former [2003/43]AT11.12.2002
CH11.12.2002
FI11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
LI11.12.2002
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
Former [2003/39]AT11.12.2002
CH11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
LI11.12.2002
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
Former [2003/37]AT11.12.2002
GR11.12.2002
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
Former [2003/31]GR11.12.2002
PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
Former [2003/29]PT11.03.2003
SE11.03.2003
Former [2003/27]SE11.03.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]US5771089  (BARTH RUDOLF) [A] 1,10 * column 6, line 21 - line 42; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5644374  (MUKAIYAMA HIROYUKI ET AL) [A] 1,10 * column 5, line 1 - column 6, line 17 *;
 [A]US4676610  (BARKAN ERIC F ET AL) [A] 1,10 * column 5, line 34 - column 6, line 45 *
ExaminationUS5726734