Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995635

EP0995635 - Rotatably closing antitheft covering for car apparatus. [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.07.2004
Database last updated on 23.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.07.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.09.2004  [2004/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pioneer Corporation
4-1, Meguro 1-chome
Meguro-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
Pioneer Corporation
4-1 Meguro 1-chome
Meguro-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Suzuki, Tomino, c/o Pioneer Corporation, Kawagoe W
25-1, Aza Nishimachi, Oaza Yamada
Kawagoe-shi Sitama / JP
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Brunner, Michael John
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Brunner, Michael John
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date99308366.622.10.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateJP1998031991223.10.1998         Original published format: JP 31991298
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0995635
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0995635
Date:21.03.2001
[2001/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0995635
Date:24.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:B60R11/02
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/50]
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Autogerät- Diebstahlschutz mit aufklappbarer Verschlussklappe[2000/17]
English:Rotatably closing antitheft covering for car apparatus.[2000/17]
French:Couvercle antivol pivotant pour équipement de véhicule[2000/17]
Examination procedure05.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/18]
03.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.07.2003Fee for grant paid
16.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH10119660  ;
 [A]JPH1016653  ;
 [A]JPH04260844  ;
 [A]JPH07285390  ;
 [A]JPH09254720  ;
 [A]EP0338405  (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figures 2-4 * * abstract * * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 15 *;
 [PA]JPH11240389
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 05, [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930126), vol. 017, no. 041, Database accession no. (M - 1359), [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 1996, no. 02, [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01, [A] 1 * abstract *
 [PA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991222), vol. 1999, no. 14, [PA] 1 * abstract *