Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0999541

EP0999541 - Context sharing for similar words in context dependent hidden markov models [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.02.2001
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.04.2001 [2001/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/19]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Gandhi, Malan Bhatki
944 Cass Lane
Elk Grove Village, Illinois 60007 / US
02 / Jacob, John
802 Hidden Creek Lane
North Aurora, Illinois 60542 / US
[2000/19]
Representative(s)Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green
Essex, IG8 0TU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/19]Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr. , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB
Application number, filing date99308390.625.10.1999
[2000/19]
Priority number, dateUS1998018462002.11.1998         Original published format: US 184620
[2000/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0999541
Date:10.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:G10L15/14
[2000/19]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2001/04]
Former [2000/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kontext-Teilung für ähnliche Wörter in kontexabhängig modellierten Hidden- Markov- Modellen[2000/19]
English:Context sharing for similar words in context dependent hidden markov models[2000/19]
French:Partage de contexte pour mots semblables dans des modèles de Markov cachés dépendant du contexte[2000/19]
Examination procedure25.10.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
04.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/19]
02.06.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.06.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
13.10.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/14]
10.11.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2001/14]
Documents cited:Search[XA]  GANDHI M B ET AL, "NATURAL NUMBER RECOGNITION USING MCE TRAINED INTER-WORD CONTEXT DEPENDENT ACOUSTIC MODELS", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING,US,NEW YORK, NY: IEEE, (1998), vol. CONF. 23, ISBN 0-7803-4429-4, pages 457 - 460, XP000854614 [X] 1,4,5,7-10,13,15-17 * abstract * * paragraph [02.2] * [A] 11,12

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1998.674466