Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0997254

EP0997254 - Tire curing press center mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.05.2003
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.07.2003  [2003/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MCNEIL & NRM, INC.
96 East Crosier Street Akron
Ohio 44311-2392 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]For all designated states
MCNEIL & NRM, INC.
96 East Crosier Street
Akron, Ohio 44311-2392 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Singh, Anand P.
2221 Candlewood Lane
Akron, Ohio 44333 / US
[2000/18]
Representative(s)Dawson, Elizabeth Ann , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co.
235 High Holborn
London
WC1V 7LE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]Dawson, Elizabeth Ann , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date99308432.626.10.1999
[2000/18]
Priority number, dateUS1998017884226.10.1998         Original published format: US 178842
[2000/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0997254
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0997254
Date:03.01.2001
[2001/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP20.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:B29C35/02, B30B5/02, B29D30/06, // B29L30:00
[2000/44]
Former International [2000/18]B29C35/02, B30B5/02, // B29L30:00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/38]
Former [2000/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Zentriervorrichtung für Reifenvulkanisiermaschine[2000/18]
English:Tire curing press center mechanism[2000/18]
French:Mécanisme de centrage pour machine de vulcanisation de pneus[2000/18]
Examination procedure14.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/29]
30.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/29]
14.02.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB1388055  (CHODOS NP) [Y] 10,11 * page 3, line 64 - line 70 * * figure 10 *;
 [Y]US5641521  (SARUMARU SHOGO [JP]) [Y] 10,11 * column 4, line 15 - line 29 * * figures 1,3 *;
 [Y]US5776508  (IRIE NOBUHIKO [JP]) [Y] 14,15 * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 3 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]US5776507  (URESHINO KASHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 14,15 * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 54 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US5798123  (MITAMURA HISASHI [JP], et al) [A] 14 * abstract * * figure 1 *;
 [A]JPH03236912  ;
 [A]US2970342  (ADOLF FROHLICH, et al) [A] 1,3,19 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2775789  (SODERQUIST LESLIE E) [A] 1,3,19 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920120), vol. 016, no. 021, Database accession no. (M - 1201), [A] 14 * abstract *