Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1001222

EP1001222 - Multi-hole film cooled combustor liner [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.11.2007
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.11.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.12.2007  [2007/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/20]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Patterson, David B.
6350 Hummingbrook
Mason, Ohio 45040 / US
02 / Duncan, Beverly Stephenson
7113 Gregory Creek Lane
West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US
03 / Rettig, Mark Gerard
1159 Coronado Avenue
Cincinnati, Ohio 45238 / US
04 / Thompson, James Edward
6727 Eldorado Drive
Middletown, Ohio 45044 / US
05 / Wiehe, Glenn Edward
7854 Harrison Avenue
Mt. Healthy, Ohio 45231 / US
[2000/20]
Representative(s)Pedder, James Cuthbert , et al
London Patent Operation
General Electric International, Inc.
15 John Adam Street
London WC2N 6LU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/20]Pedder, James Cuthbert , et al
GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street
London WC2R 3AA / GB
Application number, filing date99308437.526.10.1999
[2000/20]
Priority number, dateUS1998019155813.11.1998         Original published format: US 191558
[2000/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1001222
Date:17.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1001222
Date:20.03.2002
[2002/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1001222
Date:03.01.2007
Language:EN
[2007/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:F23R3/00, F23R3/06
[2000/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/50]
Former [2000/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Brennkammerhemd mit Filmkühlung[2000/20]
English:Multi-hole film cooled combustor liner[2000/20]
French:Chemise de chambre de combustion avec refroidissement par couche d'air[2000/20]
Examination procedure20.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/47]
14.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.06.2006Date of oral proceedings
26.06.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.06.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
06.11.2006Fee for grant paid
06.11.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.10.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
02.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
31.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
31.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0512670  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-6,10,11 * column 2, line 25 - line 27; figures 3,3A *;
 [X]US5323602  (DEFEVER GUIDO J [US]) [X] 1-7 * column 3, line 67 - line 68; figures 1,4,6 *;
 [E]EP0972992  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [E] 1-5 * column 7, lines 11-13,57; figure -; claim 10 *;
 [X]FR1493144  (LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD) [X] 1,5-7 * page 1, column 2; figure 2 *;
 [X]US4296606  (REIDER SAMUEL B) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 57 - line 63; figure 1 *;
 [X]US5261223  (FOLTZ HOWARD L [US]) [X] 1-3 * figure 3 *;
 [X]US2692014  (MACCRACKEN CALVIN D) [X] 1-3 * figure 1 *