Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0999530

EP0999530 - Visual alerting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.04.2004
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.06.2004  [2004/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
[2002/11]
Former [2000/19]For all designated states
NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD.
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / Armstrong, Andrew
27 Dean Road
Hounslow, Middlesex TW3 2EY / GB
02 / Mote, Steven
Saxon House
Charlton Musgrove, Somerset BA9 8EX / GB
[2000/19]
Representative(s)Higgin, Paul , et al
Swindell & Pearson Limited
48 Friar Gate
Derby DE1 1GY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/20]Higgin, Paul , et al
Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate
Derby DE1 1GY / GB
Former [2000/19]Jeffery, Kendra Louise , et al
Nokia IPR Department, Nokia House, Summit Avenue
Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 0NG / GB
Application number, filing date99308448.226.10.1999
[2000/19]
Priority number, dateGB1998002442206.11.1998         Original published format: GB 9824422
[2000/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0999530
Date:10.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0999530
Date:19.07.2000
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0999530
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:G08B5/22, G08B5/24, H04M1/725
[2000/29]
Former International [2000/19]G08B5/22, G08B5/24
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   NL,   SE [2001/14]
Former [2000/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Einrichtung zur visuellen Warnung[2000/19]
English:Visual alerting apparatus[2000/19]
French:Dispositif d'alarme visuel[2000/19]
Examination procedure19.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/12]
19.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.03.2003Fee for grant paid
31.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[PA]FR2765431  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [PA] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH0313151  ;
 [A]US4707855  (PASINSKI RALPH R [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 5 *;
 [A]US5801466  (ODAGIRI TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]JPS63272148  ;
 [A]JPH01103344
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910329), vol. 015, no. 130, Database accession no. (E - 1051), [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890308), vol. 013, no. 099, Database accession no. (E - 724), [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890803), vol. 013, no. 344, Database accession no. (E - 797), [A] 1 * abstract *