Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0997284

EP0997284 - Printheads [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.10.2007
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.10.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.11.2007  [2007/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
[N/P]
Former [2006/51]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company A Delaware Corporation
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
Former [2000/18]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, California 94304 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Courian, Kenneth J.
11080 Ipai Court
San Diego, CA 92127 / US
02 / Sabo, Thomas, M.
4064 Risa Court
San Diego, CA 92124 / US
03 / Pietrzyk, Joe R.
16084 Blazewood Way
San Diego, CA 92127 / US
04 / Bauer, Stephen W.
4519 Pescadero Avenue
San Diego, CA 92107 / US
[2000/18]
Representative(s)Powell, Stephen David , et al
Williams Powell Staple Court 11 Staple Inn Buildings
London, WC1V 7QH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]Powell, Stephen David , et al
WILLIAMS, POWELL & ASSOCIATES 4 St Paul's Churchyard
London EC4M 8AY / GB
Application number, filing date99308466.426.10.1999
[2000/18]
Priority number, dateUS1998017936226.10.1998         Original published format: US 179362
[2000/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0997284
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0997284
Date:06.09.2000
[2000/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0997284
Date:20.12.2006
Language:EN
[2006/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP20.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/14, B41J2/175
[2000/36]
Former International [2000/18]B41J2/14
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/21]
Former [2000/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Druckköpfe[2000/18]
English:Printheads[2000/18]
French:Têtes d'impression[2000/18]
Examination procedure16.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/50]
05.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.05.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.09.2006Fee for grant paid
11.09.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.09.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
25.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
27.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[DXA]US5638101  (KEEFE BRIAN J [US], et al) [DX] 1,3,4,6,9,10 * column 19, paragraph 3; figure 20 * [A] 8;
 [X]US5793393  (COVEN PATRICK J [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6,10 * column 4, line 32 - line L; figure 4 *;
 [A]EP0659561  (FUJI XEROX CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 13, paragraphs 2-4; figures 16,17 *
by applicantUS5638101
 US5278584
 US19910658726