Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0997786

EP0997786 - Toner and two-component developer for electrophotographic process and image formation method and image formation apparatus using the toner [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  26.04.2013
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2013Revocation of patentpublished on 29.05.2013  [2013/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ricoh Company, Ltd.
3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]For all designated states
Ricoh Company, Ltd.
3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kuroda, Noboru
Ricoh Comp.Ltd., 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
02 / Nakamura, Yasushi
Ricoh Comp.Ltd., 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
03 / Ito, Ryoichi
Ricoh Comp.Ltd., 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
04 / Iwamoto, Yasuaki
Ricoh Comp.Ltd., 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
05 / Katoh, Kohki
Ricoh Comp.Ltd., 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
06 / Kondou, Tomio
Ricoh Comp.Ltd., 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
07 / Uehara, Kenichi
Ricoh Comp.Ltd., 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
08 / Sugiyama, Yoshihiro
Ricoh Comp.Ltd., 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
09 / Sanui, Yasuyuki
Ricoh Comp.Ltd., 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
[2000/18]
Representative(s)Waldren, Robin Michael , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[2013/04]
Former [2012/17]Oxley, Robin John George , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
Former [2000/18]Whalley, Kevin
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date99308474.826.10.1999
[2000/18]
Priority number, dateJP1998031986026.10.1998         Original published format: JP 31986098
JP1999006748912.03.1999         Original published format: JP 6748999
[2000/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0997786
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0997786
Date:07.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:G03G9/08
[2000/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/03]
Former [2000/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Toner und Zwei-Komponenten-Entwickler für das elektrofotografische Verfahren und Bilderzeugungsverfahren und Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung unter Anwendung desselben[2000/18]
English:Toner and two-component developer for electrophotographic process and image formation method and image formation apparatus using the toner[2000/18]
French:Toner, révélateur à deux composants pour procédé électrophotographique et méthode de formation d'images et appareil de formation d'images l'utilisant[2000/18]
Examination procedure25.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/18]
12.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.10.2003Fee for grant paid
20.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.10.2004  15.10.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Spandern, Uwe
Auf dem Dannenkamp 19
46395 Bocholt / DE
Opponent's representative
Ahrens, Gabriele, et al
Patentanwälte Einsel & Kollegen Jasperallee 1A
38102 Braunschweig / DE
 02  07.10.2004  03.11.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Bismanns H.
Lauthstrasse 52
80999 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Albrecht, Thomas, et al
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/44]
Opponent(s)01  07.10.2004  15.10.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Spandern, Uwe
Auf dem Dannenkamp 19
46395 Bocholt / DE
Opponent's representative
Ahrens, Gabriele, Dr., et al
Patentanwälte Einsel & Kollegen Jasperallee 1A
38102 Braunschweig / DE
 02  07.10.2004  03.11.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Bismanns H.
Lauthstrasse 52
80999 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Albrecht, Thomas, et al
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Former [2004/50]
Opponent(s)01  07.10.2004  15.10.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Spandern, Uwe
Auf dem Dannenkamp 19
46395 Bocholt / DE
Opponent's representative
Ahrens, Gabriele, Dr., et al
Patentanwälte Einsel & Kollegen Jasperallee 1A
38102 Braunschweig / DE
 02  07.10.2004   
Bismanns H.
Lauthstrasse 52
80999 Müunchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Albrecht, Thomas, Dr., et al
Kraus & Weisert, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
15.11.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.05.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
09.09.2008Date of oral proceedings
10.10.2008Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
10.10.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.04.2013Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
19.04.2013Legal effect of revocation of patent [2013/22]
Appeal following opposition12.12.2008Appeal received No.  T0143/09
20.02.2009Statement of grounds filed
25.01.2013Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
25.01.2013Date of oral proceedings
01.02.2013Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0541113  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,7,17,18,29,30 * page 21; example COMP.EX.1 * * figure 2 *;
 [X]EP0314459  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,3,7,15,17,18,29,30 * page 16 - page 18; example COMP.EX.1 * * claim 23 *;
 [X]EP0330498  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,3,7,17,18,29,30,9-11,21-24,33,34 * page 26 - page 27; examples COMP.,EX.,10 * * claims 19,22 *;
 [A]EP0606930  (MITA INDUSTRIAL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,9,12,15-17,19,21,25,29,31,33,35 * page 20; example 4; table 1 *