blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0997271

EP0997271 - Method of laminating a foldable strip of spaced opaque panels [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.12.2004
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip31.12.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.02.2005  [2005/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gardiner, Pamela J.
Oakwood Farm, Moutheys Lane Oakwood
Chichester P018 8AA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/33]For all designated states
Gardiner, Pamela J.
Oakwood Farm, Moutheys Lane
Oakwood, Chichester P018 8AA / GB
Former [2000/18]For all designated states
Gardiner Laminating Limited
Southampton Road
Portsmouth, Hampshire PO6 4RJ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Gardiner, Charles
The Garden House, Mill Road
Slindon, Nr Arundel BN18 0LY / GB
[2000/18]
Representative(s)Goddard, Frances Anna
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/20]Goddard, Frances Anna
D Young & Co 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Former [2000/26]Boden, Keith McMurray, et al
D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Former [2000/18]Purvis, William Michael Cameron
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date99308484.727.10.1999
[2000/18]
Priority number, dateGB1998002363728.10.1998         Original published format: GB 9823637
[2000/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0997271
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0997271
Date:21.11.2001
[2001/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0997271
Date:25.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.10.2001
ClassificationIPC:B32B31/18, B42D15/00, // B42D5/02
[2001/47]
CPC:
B32B37/226 (EP); B32B2038/042 (EP); B32B38/105 (EP)
Former IPC [2000/18]B32B31/18, // B42D5/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/18]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Laminieren einer faltbaren Bahn von undurchsichtigen Platten mit Zwischenraum[2000/18]
English:Method of laminating a foldable strip of spaced opaque panels[2000/18]
French:Procédé pour laminer une bande pliable comportant des plaques opaques espacées[2000/18]
Examination procedure26.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/27]
30.10.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.11.2003Fee for grant paid
13.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.11.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
08.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
09.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US3514355  (WELIN-BERGER GUY JOHN OLOF) [A] 1,4 * abstract *;
 [A]US4850611  (SKELTON VIVIAN G A [US]) [A] 1,4 * figures 4-8 *;
 [A]EP0359057  (PROFOR AB [SE]) [A] 1,4 * abstract *;
 [A]US5453142  (KLEIN ANDRE [NL]) [A] 1,4* abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.