Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1010943

EP1010943 - Flame monitoring methods and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.07.2006
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.01.2016Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 24.02.2016  [2016/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Forney Corporation
3405 Wiley Post Road Carrollton
Texas 75006 / US
[2005/36]
Former [2000/25]For all designated states
Forney Corporation
3405 Wiley Post Road
Carrollton, Texas 75006 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Forbes, Stewart
8 Nutmeg Close, Earley
Reading, Berkshire RG6 5GX / GB
02 / Powell, Brian
22 Loosen Drive
Maidenhead, Berkshire SL6 3UR / GB
[2000/25]
Representative(s)Foster, David Martyn , et al
Mathisen & Macara LLP
120 Bridge Road
Chertsey
Surrey KT16 8LA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/25]Foster, David Martyn , et al
MATHISEN MACARA & CO. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road
Ickenham Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB
Application number, filing date99308595.029.10.1999
[2000/25]
Priority number, dateGB1998002771916.12.1998         Original published format: GB 9827719
[2000/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1010943
Date:21.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1010943
Date:16.05.2001
[2001/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1010943
Date:07.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:F23N5/08
[2000/25]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2002/07]
Former [2000/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Flammenüberwachung[2000/25]
English:Flame monitoring methods and apparatus[2000/25]
French:Procédé et dispositif de surveillance de flamme[2000/25]
Examination procedure13.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/05]
17.11.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
04.04.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) ES
28.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.07.2005Fee for grant paid
05.07.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
06.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
06.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
09.01.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200103   M06   Fee paid on   28.01.2002
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR31.10.2005
[2016/08]
Former [2015/37]FR07.11.2005
Former [2011/35]FR07.11.2005
Former [2010/20]deleted
Former [2007/34]IT29.10.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2204428  (BRITISH GAS PLC) [A] 1-4,13,15 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0616200  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4,13 * column 1, line 56 - column 3, line 24; figure - *;
 [A]US5249954  (ALLEN MARK G [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5,13 * column 6, line 6 - line 35; figure - *;
 [A]EP0802372  (BFI AUTOMATION GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,13 * the whole document *