Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0997263

EP0997263 - Manufacturing method and apparatus for pneumatic tyres [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.07.2004
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.07.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.08.2004  [2004/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Akiyama, Naruhiro
2-5-502, Ogawahigashi-cho 3-chome
Kodaira-City, Tokyo / JP
[2000/18]
Representative(s)Whalley, Kevin
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]Whalley, Kevin
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date99308658.601.11.1999
[2000/18]
Priority number, dateJP1998031018330.10.1998         Original published format: JP 31018398
[2000/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0997263
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0997263
Date:02.11.2000
[2000/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0997263
Date:27.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:B29D30/36, B29D30/24
[2000/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/29]
Former [2000/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Luftreifen[2000/18]
English:Manufacturing method and apparatus for pneumatic tyres[2000/18]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication de pneumatiques[2000/18]
Examination procedure09.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/11]
14.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.06.2003Fee for grant paid
19.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[DY]EP0613767  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [DY] 1,4,5,7-11,14,15,17-20 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US4470867  (CARETTA RENATO [IT], et al) [Y] 1,4,5,7-11,14,15,17-20 * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 13 * * column 5, line 53 - column 6, line 4 * * figure - *;
 [A]US5273612  (SUETOMI SATORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3923572  (GARVER RICHARD F) [A] 1-20 * column 2, line 11 - column 4, line 48 * * figure - *