Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0999339

EP0999339 - Metal-to-metal seal assembly for oil and gas production apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.10.2005
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.11.2005  [2005/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC.
P.O. Box 819052
Dallas
Texas 75381-9052 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/19]For all designated states
Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
P.O. Box 819052
Dallas, Texas 75381-9052 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Ezell, Michael D.
1203 Rooney Lane
Carrolton, Texas 75007 / US
[2000/19]
Representative(s)Wain, Christopher Paul , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London
WC1V 7LE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/19]Wain, Christopher Paul , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date99308660.201.11.1999
[2000/19]
Priority number, dateUS1998018522003.11.1998         Original published format: US 185220
[2000/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0999339
Date:10.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0999339
Date:18.07.2001
[2001/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:E21B23/04, E21B33/10, E21B33/1295, E21B33/12, F16J15/08, F16J15/32
[2001/29]
Former International [2000/19]E21B23/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2002/15]
Former [2000/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Metall auf Metall Dichtungsanordnung für Vorrichtung für die Produktion von Öl und Gas[2000/19]
English:Metal-to-metal seal assembly for oil and gas production apparatus[2000/19]
French:Ensemble d'étanchéité métal contre métal pour appareil de production de pétrole et de gaz[2000/19]
Examination procedure22.10.2001Examination requested  [2002/01]
01.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.05.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/47]
24.06.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/47]
Request for further processing for:22.09.2004Request for further processing filed
22.09.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.10.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
12.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US5044672  (SKEELS HAROLD B [US], et al) [X] 1,5-10 * column 4, lines 3-48; figures 5,7,10-15 *;
 [XY]US5685369  (ELLIS STEVEN C [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,9 * column 2, line 34 - column 4, line 6; figures 1D,2 * [Y] 3,4;
 [X]EP0461741  (COOPER IND INC [US]) [X] 1,9 * column 4, lines 28-44; figures 3-5 * * column 6, lines 3-15 * * column 6, line 30 - column 7, line 3 *;
 [X]EP0272771  (CAMERON IRON WORKS INC [US]) [X] 1,9 * column 6, line 33 - column 7, line 16; figures 4,5 *;
 [X]US4178020  (DOPYERA EMIL E [US]) [X] 1,9 * column 2, lines 45-53; figures 3-5 * * column 3, lines 44-64 *;
 [Y]US5662341  (EZELL MICHAEL DALE [US], et al) [Y] 3,4 * abstract *;
 [A]US4749043  (RODENBERGER C MARK [US]) [A] 1,5,9 * column 5, lines 1-24 *;
 [A]EP0290113  (CAMERON IRON WORKS INC [US]) [A] 1,5,9 * claims 7,8 *;
 [A]GB2265645  (OTIS ENG CO [US]) [A] 1,5,9 * figures 4-6 *;
 [A]GB2180903  (VETCO OFFSHORE IND INC) [A] 1,5,9 * figures 4-6; claim 1 *;
 [A]GB2193540  (NAT SUPPLY CO) [A] 1,5,9 * figure 7 *;
 [A]EP0622520  (COOPER IND INC [US]) [A] 1,5,9 * abstract *
by applicantUS5662341