blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1001647 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1001647



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 102
14.10.2003 Confirmation of withdrawal of application/closure of proceedings Search / examination 1
07.10.2003 Final instructions in case of withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
23.09.2003 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
05.10.2000 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
05.04.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
02.11.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
02.11.1999 Claims Search / examination 5
02.11.1999 Description Search / examination 23
02.11.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.11.1999 Drawings Search / examination 14
02.11.1999 Priority document Search / examination 47
02.11.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6