Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1001647

EP1001647 - Space/time switch architecture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  03.10.2003
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 19.11.2003  [2003/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/20]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / The inventor has agreed to waive his entitlement to designation.
02 / Wemple, James
P.O. Box 33, Rural Route HCR 70
Plymouth, VT 05056 / US
[2000/20]
Representative(s)Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green
Essex, IG8 0TU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/20]Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr. , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB
Application number, filing date99308671.902.11.1999
[2000/20]
Priority number, dateUS1998019170813.11.1998         Original published format: US 191708
[2000/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1001647
Date:17.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/20]
ClassificationInternational:H04Q11/04
[2000/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/20]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Raum-Zeit Vermittlungsarchitektur[2000/20]
English:Space/time switch architecture[2000/20]
French:Architecture de commutation spatio-temporelle[2000/20]
Examination procedure23.09.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
01.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04