blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1097797

EP1097797 - Joining thermoplastic cases and covers by fusion [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.12.2004
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, PT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Munekata Co., Ltd.
1-11-1, Horai-cho
Fukushima-shi / JP
[2004/11]
Former [2001/19]For all designated states
TOHOKU MUNEKATA Co., Ltd.
11-1, Horai-cho 1-chome
Fukushima-shi, Fukushima-Ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tanaka, Masahiro
Tohoku Munekata Co., Ltd., 11-1 Horai-cho 1-chome
Fukushima-shi, Fukushima-ken / JP
02 / Sato, Noboru
Tohoku Munekata Co., Ltd., 11-1 Horai-cho 1-chome
Fukushima-shi, Fukushima-ken / JP
 [2001/19]
Representative(s)King, James Bertram, et al
Kings Patent Agency Limited
73 Farringdon Road
London EC1M 3JQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/19]King, James Bertram, et al
Kings Patent Agency Limited, 73 Farringdon Road
London EC1M 3JQ / GB
Application number, filing date99308673.502.11.1999
[2001/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1097797
Date:09.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1097797
Date:04.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.07.2000
ClassificationIPC:B29C65/34
[2001/19]
CPC:
B29C66/542 (EP,US); B29C65/342 (EP,US); B29C65/3464 (EP,US);
B29C65/362 (EP,US); B29C66/12445 (EP,US); B29C66/24244 (EP,US);
B29C66/54 (EP,US); B29C66/8322 (EP,US); B29C65/3468 (EP,US);
B29C65/3476 (EP,US); B29C65/3676 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/19]
TitleGerman:Verbinden von thermoplastischen Gehäusen mit Deckeln durch Verschmelzen[2001/19]
English:Joining thermoplastic cases and covers by fusion[2001/19]
French:Procédé pour relier des boîtiers et des couvercles en matière thermoplastique par fusion[2001/19]
Examination procedure31.10.2001Examination requested  [2002/01]
08.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.09.2003Fee for grant paid
19.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.11.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
18.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.02.2004
BE04.02.2004
CH04.02.2004
CY04.02.2004
FI04.02.2004
IT04.02.2004
LI04.02.2004
DK04.05.2004
GR04.05.2004
SE04.05.2004
ES15.05.2004
PT04.07.2004
IE02.11.2004
LU02.11.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2007/21]AT04.02.2004
BE04.02.2004
CH04.02.2004
CY04.02.2004
FI04.02.2004
LI04.02.2004
DK04.05.2004
GR04.05.2004
SE04.05.2004
ES15.05.2004
IE02.11.2004
LU02.11.2004
Former [2006/13]AT04.02.2004
BE04.02.2004
CH04.02.2004
FI04.02.2004
LI04.02.2004
DK04.05.2004
GR04.05.2004
SE04.05.2004
ES15.05.2004
IE02.11.2004
Former [2005/02]AT04.02.2004
BE04.02.2004
CH04.02.2004
FI04.02.2004
LI04.02.2004
DK04.05.2004
GR04.05.2004
SE04.05.2004
ES15.05.2004
Former [2005/01]AT04.02.2004
BE04.02.2004
CH04.02.2004
FI04.02.2004
LI04.02.2004
GR04.05.2004
SE04.05.2004
ES15.05.2004
Former [2004/46]AT04.02.2004
CH04.02.2004
FI04.02.2004
LI04.02.2004
GR04.05.2004
SE04.05.2004
ES15.05.2004
Former [2004/44]AT04.02.2004
CH04.02.2004
FI04.02.2004
LI04.02.2004
GR04.05.2004
SE04.05.2004
Former [2004/43]AT04.02.2004
FI04.02.2004
GR04.05.2004
SE04.05.2004
Former [2004/41]FI04.02.2004
GR04.05.2004
SE04.05.2004
Former [2004/40]FI04.02.2004
SE04.05.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9309705  (KAERCHER GMBH & CO ALFRED [DE]) [X] 1-5 * figure -; claim - *;
 [X]JPS5590323  ;
 [X]JPH1016061  ;
 [X]US3561982  (OETH THOMAS F) [X] 1-5 * figures 7,8 *;
 [X]FR2142852  (MILLET JEAN) [X] 1-5 * figures 3,4 *;
 [AD]EP0823321  (MUNEKATA TOHOKU KK [JP]) [AD] 1-5 * figure - *;
 [A]GB2032877  (GRIEF BROS CORP) [A] 1,2,5 * figures 4-8 *;
 [A]JPS621524
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800917), vol. 004, no. 132, Database accession no. (M - 032), & JP55090323 A 19800708 (WAKO SANGYO KK) [X] 1-5 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 05, & JP10016061 A 19980120 (TOHOKU MUNEKATA KK) [X] 1-5 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870529), vol. 011, no. 168, Database accession no. (M - 594), & JP62001524 A 19870107 (ASAHI FIBER GLASS CO LTD) [A] * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.