Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0999051

EP0999051 - Method for assembling micro injecting device and apparatus for the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.10.2001
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.11.2001 [2001/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416, Maetan-dong
Paldal-gu
Suwon
Kyunggi-do 442-742 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2000/19]For all designated states
SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu
Suwon, Kyonggi-do 442-742 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Ahn, Byung-sun
624-2002, Dongho APT, Shinnamusil, Yongtong-dong
Paldal-gu, Suwon, Kyonggi-do / KR
02 / Nikolaevich, Dunaev Boris
Apt. 69, Kor 1, 22, Stalevarov ul
Moscow, 111558 / RU
[2000/19]
Representative(s)Tunstall, Christopher Stephen , et al
Harrison Goddard Foote
Fountain Precinct
Balm Green
Sheffield
S1 2JA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/19]Tunstall, Christopher Stephen , et al
Dibb Lupton Alsop, Fountain Precinct
Balm Green, Sheffield S1 1RZ / GB
Application number, filing date99308741.003.11.1999
[2000/19]
Priority number, dateRU1998011995303.11.1998         Original published format: RU 98119953
[2000/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0999051
Date:10.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0999051
Date:08.11.2000
[2000/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/14, B41J2/16
[2000/45]
Former International [2000/19]B41J2/14
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/30]
Former [2000/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Zusammenbau einer Mikrospritzvorrichtung und dazugehöriger Apparat[2000/19]
English:Method for assembling micro injecting device and apparatus for the same[2000/19]
French:Procédé d'assemblage d'un micro-dispositif d'injection et appareil pour sa mise en oeuvre[2000/19]
Examination procedure16.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/19]
09.05.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/48]
08.06.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2001/48]
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0816083  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1,17 * column 7, line 13 - line 46; figure 8 *;
 [A]US5506610  (ALTAVELA ROBERT P [US], et al) [A] 1,17 * column 4, line 17 - line 39; figure 1 *;
 [A]  "POLISHING CARRIER DESIGN", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN,US,IBM CORP. NEW YORK, (19910301), vol. 33, no. 10A, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 197 - 198, XP000110013 [A] 17 * the whole document *
by applicantUS4490728
 US4809428
 US5140345
 US5274400
 US5420627
 US4480259
 US5681152
 US5659346