blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0998839

EP0998839 - Regulator for nurse induction unit on air seeders [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.01.2005
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.01.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.02.2005  [2005/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CNH Canada Ltd.
100 King Street West 1 First Canadian Place, Suite 660
Toronto, ON, M5X 1B8 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2004/11]For all designated states
CNH Canada Ltd.
100 King Street West 1 First Canadian Place, Suite 660
Toronto, ON, M5X 1B8 / CA
Former [2000/19]For all designated states
FLEXI-COIL LTD.
PO Box 1928, 1000 - 71st Street East
Saskatoon Saskatchewan S7K 3S5 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Mayerle, Dean J.
214 Pezer Lane
Saskatoon, Saskatchewan S7S 1J9 / CA
02 / Hundeby, David R.
Box No. 198. R.R. 4
Saskatoon, Saskatchewan S7K 3JF / CA
03 / Engen, Ronald N.
95, Ramsay Court
Saskatoon, Saskatchewan S7H 4H3 / CA
04 / Neufeld, George
167, Nokomis Crescent
Saskatoon, Saskatchewan S7K 5C9 / CA
[2000/19]
Representative(s)Messulam, Alec Moses
Harrison IP Limited
3 Ebor House
London Ebor Business Park
Millfield Lane
Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/19]Messulam, Alec Moses
A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway
Leigh-on-Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB
Application number, filing date99308778.204.11.1999
[2000/19]
Priority number, dateUS19980107154P05.11.1998         Original published format: US 107154 P
[2000/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0998839
Date:10.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0998839
Date:12.07.2000
[2000/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0998839
Date:03.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.05.2000
ClassificationIPC:A01C7/08, A01C7/10
[2000/29]
CPC:
A01C7/081 (EP,US); A01C7/102 (EP,US); Y02P60/00 (EP,US);
Y10S111/90 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2000/19]A01C7/08
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/13]
Former [2000/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Regler für Induktorgerät in Behälter für pneumatische Drillmaschinen[2000/19]
English:Regulator for nurse induction unit on air seeders[2000/19]
French:Régulateur pour réservoir inducteur destiné aux semoirs pneumatiques[2000/19]
Examination procedure12.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/06]
05.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.10.2003Fee for grant paid
17.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
06.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[E]US5980163  (GREGOR DAVID WALTER [US], et al) [E] 1,3 * column 2, line 1 - line 26 * * column 3, line 45 - column 5, line 51 * * column 7, line 9 - line 57 * * column 8, line 66 - column 9, line 13 * * figures 1-9,15,16 *;
 [E]US5979343  (GREGOR DAVID WALTER [US], et al) [E] 1,2 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 18 * * column 3, line 17 - line 39 * * column 4, line 1 - line 9 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US4646941  (GROSSE-SCHARMANN FRANZ [DE], et al) [A] 1,3,4,10 * column 1, line 7 - line 11 * * column 1, line 44 - line 50 * * column 2, line 32 - line 54 * * column 3, line 7 - line 24 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]FR2730713  (NODET GOUGIS [FR]) [A] 1,3,4,8,17 * page 4, line 22 - line 30 * * page 5, line 3 - line 7 * * page 5, line 17 - line 35 * * page 7, line 33 - page 8, line 2 * * page 9, line 6 - line 14 * * page 10, line 4 - line 12 * * figures 1-3 *
by applicantUS5161473
 US5156102
 US4060181
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.