Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0998840

EP0998840 - Nurse receiver and header for air seeders [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.01.2005
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 20.08.2008  [2008/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CNH Canada Ltd.
100 King Street West 1 First Canadian Place, Suite 660
Toronto, ON, M5X 1B8 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2004/11]For all designated states
CNH Canada Ltd.
100 King Street West 1 First Canadian Place, Suite 660
Toronto, ON, M5X 1B8 / CA
Former [2000/19]For all designated states
FLEXI-COIL LTD.
PO Box 1928, 1000 - 71st Street East
Saskatoon Saskatchewan S7K 3S5 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Mayerle, Dean J.
214, Pezer Lane
Saskatoon, Saskatchewan S7S 1J9 / CA
02 / Hundeby, David R.
Box No. 198, R.R. no. 4
Saskatoon, Saskatchewan S7K 3J7 / CA
03 / Engen, Ronald N.
95, Ramsay Court
Saskatoon, Saskatchewan S7H 4H3 / CA
[2000/19]
Representative(s)Messulam, Alec Moses
Harrison IP Limited
3 Ebor House
London Ebor Business Park
Millfield Lane
Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]Messulam, Alec Moses
A. Messulam & Co. Ltd. 43-45 High Road Bushy Heath Bushy
Hertfordshire WD23 1EE / GB
Former [2000/19]Messulam, Alec Moses
A. Messulam & Co. Ltd., 24 Broadway
Leigh-on-Sea, Essex SS9 1BN / GB
Application number, filing date99308779.004.11.1999
[2000/19]
Priority number, dateUS19980107154P05.11.1998         Original published format: US 107154 P
[2000/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0998840
Date:10.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0998840
Date:05.07.2000
[2000/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0998840
Date:03.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:A01C7/08, A01C7/04
[2000/28]
Former International [2000/19]A01C7/08
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/12]
Former [2000/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Lager- und Sammelbehälter in pneumatischen Drillmaschinen[2000/19]
English:Nurse receiver and header for air seeders[2000/19]
French:Récepteur et collecteur pour réservoir destiné aux semoirs pneumatiques[2000/19]
Examination procedure12.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/06]
05.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.10.2003Fee for grant paid
17.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
06.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]FR2730712  (NODET GOUGIS [FR]) [X] 14 * page 4, line 22 - page 5, line 12 * * page 7, line 22 - page 8, line 7 * * page 9, line 13 - page 11, line 19 * * page 15, line 11 - line 25 * * figures 1,2,5-9 * [Y] 1,2,15-17,23,24,30;
 [YA]FR2233807  (NODET GOUGIS [FR]) [Y] 1,2,15-17,23,24,30 * page 1, line 37 - page 2, line 31 * * figure 1 * [A] 3,4,31;
 [A]US3606103  (TAYLOR BILLY R) [A] 18,25 * column 1, line 18 - line 24 * * figure 2 *
by applicantUS5161473
 US5156102
 US4060181