Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1009208

EP1009208 - Connection structure of electrical component [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.08.2005
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.08.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.10.2005  [2005/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD.
1-7 Yukigaya Otsuka-cho Ota-ku
Tokyo 145 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/24]For all designated states
ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD.
1-7 Yukigaya Otsuka-cho
Ota-ku Tokyo 145 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Asano, Masahiro
20 Aza-shirahagi, Isozaki, Matsushima-cho
Miyagi-gun, Miyagi-ken / JP
[2000/24]
Representative(s)Kensett, John Hinton
Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford
WD18 0JU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/24]Kensett, John Hinton
Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road
Watford, Hertfordshire WD1 7HE / GB
Application number, filing date99308848.305.11.1999
[2000/24]
Priority number, dateJP1998033379725.11.1998         Original published format: JP 33379798
[2000/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1009208
Date:14.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1009208
Date:02.11.2000
[2000/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1009208
Date:20.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:H05K7/02, H05K1/16
[2000/24]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/29]
Former [2000/24]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Anschlussstruktur für ein elektrisches Bauteil[2000/24]
English:Connection structure of electrical component[2000/24]
French:Structure de connexion d'un composant électrique[2000/44]
Former [2000/24]Structure de connexion d' un composant électrique
Examination procedure13.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/50]
06.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.07.2004Fee for grant paid
24.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US4479106  (SHIMIZU YUTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *