Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1000590

EP1000590 - An improved stent which is easly recaptured and repositioned within the body [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  06.09.2013
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2013Revocation of patentpublished on 09.10.2013  [2013/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cordis Corporation
14201 N.W. 60th Avenue
Miami Lakes
Florida 33014 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/32]For all designated states
Cordis Corporation
14201 N.W. 60th Avenue
Miami Lakes, Florida 33014 / US
Former [2000/20]For all designated states
Cordis Corporation
14201 N.W. 60th Avenue
Miami Lakes Florida 33014 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Letendre, Robert P.
7210 NW 179th Street, Apartament 206
Hialeah, Florida 33015 / US
02 / Solovay, Kenneth S.
16732 Diamond Dr.
Fort Lauderdale, Florida 33331 / US
[2000/22]
Former [2000/20]01 / Letendre, Robert P.
7210 NW 179th Street
Miami, Florida 33015 / US
02 / Solovay, Kenneth S.
16732 Diamond Dr.
Fort Lauderdale, Florida 33331 / US
Representative(s)Mercer, Christopher Paul
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London
WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/20]Mercer, Christopher Paul
Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date99308865.708.11.1999
[2000/20]
Priority number, dateUS1998018858209.11.1998         Original published format: US 188582
[2000/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1000590
Date:17.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1000590
Date:10.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/06
[2000/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2001/05]
Former [2000/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Leicht entfernbarer und in den Körper wieder einsetzbarer Stent[2000/20]
English:An improved stent which is easly recaptured and repositioned within the body[2000/20]
French:Stent facilement récupérable pour reposition dans le corps[2000/20]
Examination procedure23.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/51]
17.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.03.2005Fee for grant paid
21.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04075519.1  / EP1433441
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  09.05.2006   
Variomed AG
Gagozstrasse 51
9496 Balzers / LI
Opponent's representative
Pellkofer, Dieter, et al
Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2006/25]
Opponent(s)01  09.05.2006   
Variomed AG
Gagozstrasse 51
9496 Balzers / LI
Opponent's representative
Pellkofer, Dieter, et al
Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
28.07.2006Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.12.2012Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.01.2013
23.01.2013Date of oral proceedings
27.05.2013Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
05.06.2013Legal effect of revocation of patent [2013/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
12.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0579523  (CELSA L G SA [FR], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9823322  (BOSTON SCIENT CORP [US]) [A] 1 * page 13, line 12 - line 18; figure 2 *
ExaminationEP0749731
by applicantUS5316023
 US5360443
 US5578071
 US5591229
 US4733665
 US4739762